CA AB1601 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1406 of, to amend and renumber Section 1400 of, and to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 1400) and Article 2 (commencing with Section 1409) to Chapter 4 of Part 4 of Division 2 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment protections: mass layoff, relocation, or termination of employees: call centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1601 Akilah Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1601 Akilah Weber By Durazo (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1601 Akilah Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1601 Akilah Weber By Durazo (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1601 Akilah Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5223.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 28). |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-06-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R., G.O. and GOV. & F. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 19.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1400 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1409 | New Code | See Bill Text |