CA AB1600 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1005 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 1043 and 1047 of the Evidence Code, relating to discovery.
Title
Discovery: personnel records: peace officers and custodial officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1600 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1600 Kalra et al. By Bradford (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1600 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1600 Kalra et al. By Bradford (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1600 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 28. Page 3411.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2773.). |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 1789.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 1043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 1047 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |