CA AB1598 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 528.5 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Impersonation for the purpose of a sexual relationship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code528.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code50Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback