CA AB1596 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to unemployment, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Unemployment: federal unemployment account: advances repayment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |