CA AB1596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25400.10, 25400.11, 25400.16, 25400.17, 25400.18, 25400.19, 25400.20, 25400.22, 25400.25, 25400.26, 25400.27, 25400.28, 25400.30, 25400.36, 25400.45, 25400.46, and 25400.47 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 6.9.1 (commencing with Section 25400.10) of Division 20 of, and to amend the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 25400.10) of Chapter 6.9.1 of Division 20 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous substances.
Title
Hazardous substances: contaminated property: fentanyl cleanup.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1596 E.S. & T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By QUIRK (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1596 E.S. & T.M. (Quirk) By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1596 E.S. & T.M. Assembly Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1596 E.S. & T.M. (Quirk) By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1596 E.S. & T.M. Assembly Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3248.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2607.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1902.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25400.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25400.47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |