CA AB1593 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17052 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: earned income credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1593 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-11SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 1984.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-08AssemblyIn committee: Hearing for testimony only.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback