CA AB1591 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13204, 13300.7, 14298, 17300, and 17303 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1591 ELECTIONS (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1591 E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1591 E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1805.). |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1692.) (June 28). |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1340.) |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 18. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13300.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14298 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 17300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 17303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |