CA AB159 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-08 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-08 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19829.9849, 19829.9850, 19829.9851, and 22944.5 of the Government Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State Employment: State Bargaining Unit 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB159 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 159 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 159 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 1662.). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 1691.) (June 28). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 491.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19829.9849 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |