CA AB1586 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 32255, 32255.1, and 32255.5 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 2.3 (commencing with Section 32255) of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: animal dissection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code32255Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32255.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32255.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback