CA AB1585 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 5 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1255.9 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 14094.20 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1585 HEALTH Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WOOD (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent AB1585 HEALTH (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Special Consent AB1585 HEALTH (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1585 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-18SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-18SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-08-18SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2021-07-08SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2021-07-08AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2021-07-08AssemblyWithdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-06-30SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
2021-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1253.)
2021-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
2021-03-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1255.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14094.20Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback