CA AB1583 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25249.7 of, and to add Section 25249.14 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to toxic substances.
Title
Proposition 65: enforcement: certificate of merit: factual basis.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1583 Chau Special Consent Calendar 1st Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1583 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1583 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1583 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1583 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3426.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2912.). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1859.) |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25249.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25249.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |