CA AB1583 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76300 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Community colleges: enrollment fee waiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1583 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1583 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5204.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27). |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 12). |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 5. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 76300.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |