CA AB1583 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 230, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 230, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 12462.5 and 16341 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Controller: state funds: reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Allen [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Assembly - AB 1583 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1583 Allen (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1583 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1583 Allen (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1583 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 230, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5899.). |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4252.). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 5366.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12462.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16341 | New Code | See Bill Text |