CA AB1578 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 52.1 and 2983.3 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 1245.020, 1245.060, 1250.320, 1260.230, 1276, and 1277 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 44944 of the Education Code, to amend Section 22329 of the Financial Code, to amend Sections 11425.20, 11440.20, 11440.30, 11507.6, 11508, 12935, 12945.2, and 19242 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 13009, 13009.1, and 103430 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10139 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 4712 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state government.
Title
Judiciary omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1578 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1578 JUD. (Stone) By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1578 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1578 JUD. (Stone) By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1578 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 2981.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2527.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 1743.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 8. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |