CA AB1577 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Part 4 (commencing with Section 18000) of Division 7 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 15904) to Part 12 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Microenterprise development: local partnerships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1577 Burke Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
2019-06-06SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-06SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-06-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code18000Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code15904New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback