CA AB1575 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19300.5, 19302, 19302.1, 19316, 19317, 19320, 19322, 19326, 19328, 19332, 19334, 19340, 19341, 19344, 19345, 19350, 19351, and 19360 of, to amend the heading of Article 5 (commencing with Section 19326) of Chapter 3.5 of Division 8 of, to add Sections 14235.5, 19310.5, 19319.5, 19322.5, and 19327.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 12029 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Section 52334 of the Food and Agricultural Code, and to amend Sections 11362.765, 11362.775, and 11362.777 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to medical cannabis.
Title
Medical cannabis.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1575 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1575 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 5131.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 27). |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 18). |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. GOV. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |