CA AB1574 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4532, 4533, 4533.1, 4534, 4535.2, 12098.3, 14838, 14842.5, 14845, and 14846 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 999.5, 999.9, 999.10, 999.11, and 999.12 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: small business liaisons and advocates and disabled veteran business enterprises: preferences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1574 J., E.D. & E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CERVANTES (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1574 J., E.D., & E . (Cervantes) By Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1574 J., E.D. & E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1574 J., E.D., & E . (Cervantes) By Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1574 J., E.D. & E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3039.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2504.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1718.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1410.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and JUD. |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12098.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14842.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14845 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14846 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4533 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4533.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4534 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 4535.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 999.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |