CA AB1573 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 90, 7090, 7712, and 8834.1 of, to add Section 1022 to, and to repeal Section 8606 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fisheries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marine fisheries: experimental fishing permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1573 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-06-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-12SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-06-15SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1845.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback