CA AB1573 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13314 and 15104 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: voting.
Sponsors
Asm. Anthony Adams [R] | Asm. Joe Coto [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Asm. Lori Saldana [D] | Asm. Sandre Swanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-04 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB1573 Committee on E. & R. (Fong) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1573 E.& R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1573 E.& R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 548, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2224.) | |
2009-09-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From inactive file. To second reading. | |
2009-06-25 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Hancock. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |
2009-05-11 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1367.) | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time. To print. |