CA AB1570 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4740, 4741, 31108, 42282, and 42370.1 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Public resources: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1570 NAT. RES. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By RIVAS, L (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1570 NAT. RES. (Rivas, L.) By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1570 NAT. RES. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1570 NAT. RES. (Rivas, L.) By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1570 NAT. RES. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2838.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2348.). |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1720.) (June 29). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1338.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 31108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42370.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4741 | Amended Code | Citation Text |