CA AB157 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 30910.7 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to the Richmond-San Rafael Bridge, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Richmond-San Rafael Bridge.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 157 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB157 Levine By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - AB 157 LEVINE Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB157 Levine By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - AB 157 LEVINE Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 393, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 2730.). |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2290.). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 712.). |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-01-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 30910.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |