CA AB1567 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 75125.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organic waste: scoping plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1567 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3899.)
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2020-01-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-01-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-15AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-01-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 13).
2020-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-01-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2020-01-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code75125.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback