CA AB1561 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65583 of, and to add Section 65914.5 to, the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning: housing element and entitlement extensions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1561 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1561 Cristina Garcia et a By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1561 Cristina Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1561 Cristina Garcia et a By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1561 Cristina Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5503.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 5498.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5456.) |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1772.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | (pending re-referral to Com. on JUD.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1238.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1238.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65914.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |