CA AB1561 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 313, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 313, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13996.55 and 63010 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.
Title
Economic development: infrastructure: logistic hubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1561 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1561 Quirk-Silva By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1561 QUIRK-SILVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1561 Quirk-Silva By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1561 QUIRK-SILVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 313, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6610.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5514.). |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3868.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9). |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13996.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53398.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 64200 | New Code | See Bill Text |