CA AB1560 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 699.6 and 971.5 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans: substance abuse programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 699.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 971.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |