CA AB1558 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to rivers.
Title
Los Angeles River: river ranger program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1558 Cristina Garcia By Allen (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1558 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1558 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2703.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 1932.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 550 | New Code | See Bill Text |