CA AB1557 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
Pending: Assembly Communications and Conveyance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 767.6 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communications: utility pole attachments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and U. & E.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code767.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback