CA AB1557 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38134 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: use by nonprofit youth organizations: recreational youth sports leagues.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Matthew Harper [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Donald Wagner [R] |
Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Sharon Runner [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1557 Mathis By Anderson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1557 MATHIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1557 MATHIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4727.). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4895.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 38134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |