CA AB1556 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12904, 12905, 12926, 12930, 12932, 12940, 12940.1, 12942, 12943, 12945, 12945.2, 12956.2, 12960, 12962, 12965, 12980, and 12986 of the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment discrimination: unlawful employment practices.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1556 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1556 Mark Stone By Atkins (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1556 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1556 Mark Stone By Atkins (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1556 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 799, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 7. Page 2942.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2324.). |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 5. Page 1384.) |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on March 28 corrected. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12932 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12942 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12943 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12945 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12945.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12960 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12980 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12986 | Amended Code | Citation Text |