CA AB1554 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2810.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employers: dependent care assistance program: notice to employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-15 - Assembly - AB 1554 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1554 Gonzalez By Mitchell (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1554 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1554 Gonzalez By Mitchell (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1554 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2721.). |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2137.). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1592.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2810.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |