CA AB1553 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 4.8 (commencing with Section 71380) of Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental protection.
Title
Southern Los Angeles Ocean Chemical Waste Community Oversight Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71380 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |