CA AB1551 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Hearing: May 31 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 65915.7 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: development bonuses: mixed-use projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1551 Santiago Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-04SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
2022-01-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2022-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3410.)
2022-01-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2022-01-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
2022-01-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-13AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 12).
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2022-01-03Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
2022-01-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2022-01-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2022-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65915.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback