CA AB1550 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39713 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Greenhouse gases: investment plan: disadvantaged communities.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1550 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 1)AB 1550 Go mez By (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1550 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 1)AB 1550 Go mez By (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1550 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6565.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6570.). |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5557.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5574.). |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5375.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5314.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 5203.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 27). |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39713 | Amended Code | Citation Text |