CA AB1550 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5068 of, and to add Section 5068.1 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: veterans' organizations license plates: fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Allen [D] | Sen. Elaine Alquist [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] |
Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Sen. Tony Strickland [R] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Assembly - AB 1550 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1550 Bonilla By Alquist (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Assembly - AB 1550 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1550 Bonilla By Alquist (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Assembly - AB 1550 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6054.). | |
2012-08-13 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-13 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4482.). | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-04-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 4340.) | |
2012-04-09 | Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-29 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-03-28 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 28). | |
2012-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-21 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 19). | |
2012-03-13 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-03-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-01-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | |
2012-01-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 5068 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5068.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |