CA AB1550 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 80130 of the Water Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Department of Water Resources: refunding bonds.
Sponsors
Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Felipe Fuentes [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Asm. Pedro Nava [D] | Asm. Ira Ruskin [D] | Asm. Sandre Swanson [D] | Sen. Norma Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB1550 Committee on B. & F. (Nava) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1550 B.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1550 B.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2009-07-09 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-07-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1669.) | |
2009-07-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2009-06-18 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1471.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-04-22 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 20). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. by unanimous consent. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and B. & F. | |
2009-03-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 11. | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time. To print. |