CA AB1544 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-14 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-14 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11169 and 11170 of, and to add Section 11169.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to child abuse.
Title
Child Abuse Central Index.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Juan Carrillo [D] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Asm. Pilar Schiavo [D] |
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Greg Wallis [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1544 Lackey Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2141.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11169.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 11170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |