CA AB1541 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-11 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-11 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25000.3 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: beer manufacturers and wholesalers: distribution.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1541 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1403.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25000.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |