CA AB1540 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 425.7 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State dinosaur: Augustynolophus morrisi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1540 Bloom et al. By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Assembly - AB 1540 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Assembly - AB 1540 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2301.). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 963.) |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 425.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |