CA AB1538 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 263, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 263, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 101850 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospital authorities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Alameda Health System Hospital Authority: physician services.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1538 BONTA Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1538 Bonta By Skinner Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1538 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1538 Bonta By Skinner Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1538 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 263, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 10. Page 2940.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2337.). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 19). |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 1709.) |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 101850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120582 | Amended Code | Citation Text |