CA AB1537 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 851.7 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 781, 786, and 793 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juvenile records: inspection: prosecutorial discovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent AB1537 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1537 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1537 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1679.). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.) |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 851.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 781 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 793 | Amended Code | Citation Text |