CA AB1535 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 631, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4800, 4804.5, 4827, 4830, 4836.2, 4841.4, 4841.5, 4848.1, 4853, 4853.1, 4853.6, 4861, 4862, 4863, 4864, 4866, 4867, 4868, 4869, 4870, 4871, 4872, 4873, 4875.2, 4883, 4900, and 4905 of, to amend the heading of Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 4860) of Chapter 11 of Division 2 of, to add Sections 4826.3, 4847.1, and 4854.1 to, to repeal Sections 4836.3, 4842.5, 4846.4, 4847, 4848, 4848.3, and 4849 of, and to repeal and add Sections 4846 and 4875.6 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterinary Medical Board: application and examination: discipline and citation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1535 Business and Professions Concurrence in Senate Amendments By LOW (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1535 B. & P. (Low) By Roth (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1535 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By LOW (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 631, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
2021-09-10AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (September 10).
2021-09-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2021-09-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 42. Noes 13.)
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4800Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4804.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4826.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4827Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4830Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4836.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4836.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4841.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4841.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4842.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4846.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4847Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4847.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4848Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4848.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4848.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4849Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4853Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4853.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4853.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4854.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4861Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4862Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4863Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4864Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4866Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4867Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4868Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4869Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4870Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4871Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4872Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4873Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4875.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4883Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4900Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4905Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback