CA AB1535 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12880.6 to the Insurance Code, relating to pet insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pet insurance: disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1535 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1772.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code12880.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback