CA AB1532 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2701, 2702, 2708, 2727, 2733, and 2786.3 of, and to add Section 2701.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1532 B. & P. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By LOW (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1532 B. & P. (Low) By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1532 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By LOW (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1532 B. & P. (Low) By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1532 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By LOW (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2928.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2347.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1618.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2701.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2708 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2727 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2733 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2786.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |