CA AB1531 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 659 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 51010, 51010.5, 51011, 51012, 51013.5, and 51015.4 of the Government Code, to add Section 25228.5 to the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 740.17 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1531 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1531 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1736.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 659 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51010.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51013.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51015.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25228.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |