CA AB153 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7908, 7910, and 7912 of, and to repeal and add Sections 7911 and 7911.1 of, the Family Code, to amend Sections 1502, 1562.01, and 50807 of, and to add Chapter 11.8 (commencing with Section 50811) and Chapter 11.9 (commencing with Section 50820) to Part 2 of Division 31 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 319, 319.3, 358.1, 361.2, 361.21, 366, 366.1, 366.3, 366.31, 636, 706.5, 706.6, 727.1, 727.2, 4096, 4096.5, 4648, 11402, 11403.3, 11461.3, 11461.36, 11462.01, 11463, 11465, 16010.7, 16121, 16501, 16501.1, 16521.6, 16521.8, and 16530 of, to add Sections 361.22, 727.12, 4096.55, 4096.6, 11402.005, 16001.1, 16010.9, and 18257.5 to, to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 16550) and Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 16585) to Part 4 of Division 9 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 18997) of Part 6 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public social services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - AB 153 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB153 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 153 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB153 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 153 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2367.). |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2364.) |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2364.) |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1979.). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1962.) |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-07-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 488.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |