CA AB1526 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 247, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 247, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1788.14 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 337 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to debt collection.
Title
Debt collection.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1526 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1526 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1526 KALRA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1526 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1526 KALRA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 247, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6365.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5277.). |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3867.) |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 17). |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 8). |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3715.) |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |