CA AB1523 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 130828 and 130828.1 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to local public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Bernardino County Transportation Authority: design-build.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1523 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1523 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2025.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1859.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2017-05-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code22161Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code130828New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code130828.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code163Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback