CA AB1518 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18895.2, 18897.6, and 18897.73 of, and to add Section 18897.74 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to athletes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student athletes: contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-19 - Assembly - AB 1518 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1518 Chu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1518 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-04 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-19AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2748.).
2019-08-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2182.).
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 3). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., ED. and JUD.
2019-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1515.)
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-29AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-29AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and HIGHER ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback