CA AB1516 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5570 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 65589.5 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 51345 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1516 H.& C.D. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CHAU (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent #8 AB1516 Committee On H. & C.D. (Chau) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1516 H.& C.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2750.).
2015-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.).
2015-08-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2015-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17).
2015-07-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2015-05-21SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2015-05-07SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1350.)
2015-05-04AssemblyOrdered to Consent Calendar. (pursuant to motion in committee on April 29, 2015)
2015-04-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2015-04-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2015-03-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 9.
2015-03-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code5570Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65589.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code51345Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1516&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20150309_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20150622_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20150904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20150928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20150429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20150507_1010AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20150714_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20150817_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20150831_0459PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20150901_1150AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback