CA AB1516 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11323.4 and 11450 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs: young child special needs supplement: supportive services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1516 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-14SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2014-08-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 24).
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2014-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5235.)
2014-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-05-07AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-22AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2014-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 8).
2014-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2014-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2014-01-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
2014-01-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1516&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20140115_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20140328_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20140422_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20140523_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20140630_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20140804_amended_sen_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20140408_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20140523_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20140528_1132AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20140624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20140804_000002_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback